Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 02/04/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 02/13/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/08/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/17/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/31/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/19/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/24/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/08/2013