Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/19/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 10/11/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/16/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/27/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/24/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/17/2014