Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 09/23/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 09/25/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/25/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/26/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/26/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/26/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/26/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/26/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/27/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/27/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/03/2013