Refine your search

Showing 18 of 18 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
04/07/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-98.
04/07/2014 Signed by President.
04/02/2014 Senate Presented to President.
Action By: Senate
04/01/2014-6:03pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2782-2783)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2014-5:57pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1557.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2014-5:57pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2782-2784)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2014-5:57pm House Mr. Pitts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
11/13/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
11/13/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
11/13/2013-2:18pm House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/13/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
11/12/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7963; text as passed Senate: CR S7963)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
10/30/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
10/30/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
10/30/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
09/27/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
09/27/2013 Senate Introduced in Senate
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate