Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/27/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/01/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/08/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/11/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/04/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/04/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/06/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/12/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 11/12/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/12/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/12/2013