There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Huna Tlingit Traditional Gull Egg Use Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Huna Tlingit Traditional Gull Egg Use Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to allow for the harvest of gull eggs by the Huna Tlingit people within Glacier Bay National Park in the State of Alaska.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/27/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment. With written report No. 113-51.
01/28/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
06/27/2013Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105.
Action By: Senate
06/27/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment. With written report No. 113-51.
05/16/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/23/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-27.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
01/28/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate
01/28/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S330)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/30/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/28/2013 Referred to
05/16/2013 Markup by
06/27/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-51
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks04/23/2013 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.156. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (06/27/2013)

Huna Tlingit Traditional Gull Egg Use Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to allow members of the Hoonah Indian Association to collect the eggs of glaucous-winged gulls up to two times a year at up to five locations within Alaska's Glacier Bay National Park.

Considers the collection of those eggs within the Park by the Association to be a use specifically permitted by the Alaska National Interest Lands Conservation Act.

Requires collection schedules and locations to be based on an annual plan prepared by the Secretary and the Association.