Refine your search

9 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
11/15/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
11/12/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
11/12/2013-2:06pm House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/31/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/30/2013 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7684-7685; text as passed Senate: CR S7685)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/30/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 228.
Type of Action: Calendars
10/30/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
10/30/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
09/30/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral