Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/30/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/30/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/04/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/13/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/24/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/27/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/28/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/28/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/12/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/28/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/30/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/08/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/15/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/15/2014