Text: S.1569 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (10/09/2013)

Calendar No. 211

113th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 1569

To ensure the complete and timely payment of the obligations of the United States Government until December 31, 2014.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
October 8, 2013

Mr. Reid (for himself and Mr. Baucus) introduced the following bill; which was read the first time

October 9, 2013

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


A BILL

To ensure the complete and timely payment of the obligations of the United States Government until December 31, 2014.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Default Prevention Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Ensuring timely payment.

Section 2 of the No Budget, No Pay Act of 2013 (31 U.S.C. 3101 note) is amended—

(1) by striking “date of the enactment of this Act” each place it appears and inserting “date of enactment of the Default Prevention Act of 2013”;

(2) in subsection (a), by striking “May 18, 2013” and inserting “December 31, 2014”; and

(3) in subsection (b), by striking “May 19, 2013” each place it appears and inserting “January 1, 2015”.


Calendar No. 211

113th CONGRESS
     1st Session
S. 1569

A BILL
To ensure the complete and timely payment of the obligations of the United States Government until December 31, 2014.

October 9, 2013
Read the second time and placed on the calendar