Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/29/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/31/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/07/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/07/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/12/2013