Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/05/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/20/2013
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 02/12/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/24/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/07/2014