There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for a sequester replacement.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/27/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
02/28/2013Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S991)
Action By: Senate
02/28/2013Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 38 - 62. Record Vote Number: 26. (consideration: CR S991; text: CR S991)
Action By: Senate
02/28/2013Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S990-991)
Action By: Senate
02/27/2013Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S927; text: CR S927)
Action By: Senate
02/27/2013Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S927)
Action By: Senate
02/27/2013Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Pursuant to the order of 2/14/2013, as modified on 2/26/2013, Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 19.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/28/2013

Committees (0)

As of 02/23/2020 text has not been received for S.16 - A bill to provide for a sequester replacement.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.16. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/27/2013)

Requires the President, by March 15, 2013, to submit to Congress a qualifying sequester replacement plan proposing to cancel permanently $85.333 billion of budgetary resources available for FY2013 from any discretionary appropriations or direct spending account. Requires further that:

  • up to $42.666.500 billion of budgetary resources be cancelled from defense spending (budget function 050);
  • any cancellation of such budgetary resources comply with the policies under and consistent with amounts authorized in the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2013 (NDAA FY2013);
  • the cancellation is not implemented through changes to programs or activities contained in the Internal Revenue Code, or increases governmental receipts, offsetting collections, or offsetting receipts;
  • any cancellation of budgetary resources in a non-defense spending account may not be offset against an increase in another such account; and
  • the proposed cancellation reduces outlays by at least $82.500 billion by the end of FY2018.

Sets forth requirements for expedited consideration of a joint resolution of disapproval in both chambers of the qualifying sequester replacement plan.

Requires the President, if the joint resolution of disapproval is not enacted within seven calendar days after March 15, 2013, to cancel: (1) any sequestration order issued under the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) for enforcement of a specified budget goal, and (2) the budgetary resources submitted in the qualifying sequester replacement plan.

Authorizes the Secretary of Defense, for FY2013, in implementing sequestration under the Gramm-Rudman-Hollins Act, to transfer amounts appropriated for the Department of Defense (DOD) by the Continuing Appropriations Resolution, 2013 among DOD accounts.

Requires the total amount in any DOD account available for obligation and expenditure in FY2013 to be consistent with, and not exceed, the amount authorized to be appropriated for that account for FY2013 by division A of the NDAA FY2013.