There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians Restoration Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians Restoration Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the Federal recognition to the Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians of Montana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/14/2014By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 113-208. Additional views filed.
04/03/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester without amendment. Without written report.
01/28/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
07/14/2014By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 113-208. Additional views filed.
Action By: Senate
04/03/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 347.
Action By: Senate
04/03/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester without amendment. Without written report.
04/02/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/30/2013Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-219.
01/28/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 02/25/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs01/28/2013 Referred to
10/30/2013 Hearings by
04/02/2014 Markup by
04/03/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-208

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.161. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (04/03/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians Restoration Act of 2013 - Extends federal recognition to the Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians of Montana. Makes the Tribe and each member eligible for all services and benefits provided by the United States to Indians and federally recognized Indian tribes, without regard to the existence of a reservation for the Tribe or the location of the residence of any member on or near an Indian reservation.

Considers the federal service area of the Tribe to be the area comprised of Blaine, Cascade, Glacier, and Hill Counties, Montana.

Directs the Tribe, as a condition of receiving recognition, services, and benefits pursuant to this Act, to submit to the Secretary of the Interior a membership roll consisting of the name of each individual enrolled as a member of the Tribe. Requires the Tribe to maintain such membership roll.

Directs the Secretary to acquire, for the benefit of the Tribe, trust title to 200 acres of land within the Tribe's service area to be used for a tribal land base.

Authorizes the Secretary to acquire additional land for the benefit of the Tribe pursuant to the Indian Reorganization Act.