Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 10/29/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/04/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 11/06/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/07/2013
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/12/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 11/18/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 11/19/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/12/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/12/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/12/2013