Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
01/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-74. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2014 Signed by President.
01/08/2014 Presented to President.
12/23/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H8130)
12/20/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S9069)
12/20/2013 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9069)
10/30/2013 Introduced in Senate