Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/05/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/14/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/08/2014