Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/28/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/30/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 01/31/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/04/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/07/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 02/25/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/16/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/22/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/22/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/16/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/03/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 06/11/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/13/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/28/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/04/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/10/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/07/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/14/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/20/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/03/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/21/2014