There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/01/2014By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/18/2014. Report No. 113-264. Additional views filed.
08/26/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/30/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
10/01/2014By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/18/2014. Report No. 113-264. Additional views filed.
Action By: Senate
08/26/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 537.
Action By: Senate
08/26/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
05/21/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
04/02/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-324.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
10/30/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate
10/30/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7678-7679, S7680)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs10/30/2013 Referred to
04/02/2014 Hearings by
05/21/2014 Markup by
08/26/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-264

No related bill information was received for S.1622.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1622. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (08/26/2014)

Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act - (Sec. 4) Establishes the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children in the Office of Tribal Justice of the Department of Justice (DOJ).

Requires the President and Congress to appoint to the Commission individuals who have significant experience and expertise in Indian affairs and matters to be studied by the Commission, including health care issues facing Native children, Indian education, juvenile justice programs, and social service programs used by Native children.

Requires the Commission to establish a Native Advisory Committee consisting of representatives of Indian tribes from each region of the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) and a native Hawaiian. Requires members of the Committee to be experienced in matters to be studied by the Commission.

Requires the Commission to conduct a comprehensive study of federal, state, local, and tribal programs that serve Native children, including an evaluation of:

  • the impact of concurrent jurisdiction on child welfare systems;
  • barriers Indian tribes and Native Hawaiians face in using public and private grant resources;
  • obstacles to nongovernmental financial support for programs benefitting Native children;
  • issues relating to the validity and statistical significance of data on Native children;
  • barriers to the development of sustainable, multidisciplinary programs designed to assist high-risk Native children and their families, as well as any examples of successful program models; and
  • barriers to interagency coordination.

Directs the Commission to use the results of the study and analyses of existing federal data to:

  • develop plans and goals for federal policy relating to Native children in the short-, mid-, and long-term informed by the development of accurate child well-being measures;
  • recommend modifications and improvements to programs that serve Native children that integrate the cultural strengths of Native communities and result in improvements to the child welfare system, the mental and physical health of Native children, educational and vocational opportunities, and tribal juvenile detention programs.
  • recommend improvements to the collection of data regarding Native children and the programs that serve them; and
  • identify models of successful federal, state, and tribal programs in the areas studied by the Commission.

Requires the Commission to submit a report to the President, Congress, and the White House Council on Native American Affairs on its findings, conclusions, and recommendations for legislative and administrative action.

Terminates the Commission 90 days after the report is submitted.