Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/05/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/20/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 01/13/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 04/02/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/13/2014