There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Keeping the Affordable Care Act Promise Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to permit the continuation of certain health plans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/04/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
11/04/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate
11/04/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7797-7798)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 11/04/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 11/07/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/07/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/12/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 11/14/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 11/19/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/18/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance11/04/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1642.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1642. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/04/2013)

Keeping the Affordable Care Act Promise Act - Permits individuals to continue their individual health insurance coverage in which they are enrolled on December 31, 2013, if they meet requirements applied to such coverage, unless the health insurance issuer cancels all coverage offered in the individual market and ceases operations as a health insurance issuer. Deems such coverage: (1) as a grandfathered health plan under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), and (2) to be minimum essential health coverage.

Amends PPACA to require health insurance issuers in the individual market annually, at the time of enrollment and renewal, to provide enrollees with a notice that states: (1) the reasons that such coverage, if applicable, does not meet the requirements under PPACA for a qualified health plan, including citations to the requirements involved; (2) that the enrollee has the right to continue to enroll in such coverage; and (3) that the enrollee has the right to enroll in a qualified health plan offered through a health care exchange and instructions on how to access the exchange.

Requires a health insurance issuer's cancellation notice for individual health insurance coverage to contain a statement of the reasons for the cancellation, including a reference to any provision of PPACA that the issuer relied upon in making the determination to cancel. Exempts from this notice requirement a health plan that has provided, before enactment of this Act, a notification of cancellation that has not yet taken effect. Allows an enrollee to continue coverage under the plan if the issuer continues to offer it, and the issuer shall provide a subsequent notification to the enrollee that states: (1) that such plan will remain in effect at the enrollee's option, and (2) the reasons that the plan does not otherwise meet PPACA requirements for a qualified health plan.