Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 11/05/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/05/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 11/06/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/06/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/06/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/13/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 11/13/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/14/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/14/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/18/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/18/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/18/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/18/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/20/2013