Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/20/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/20/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/06/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 02/06/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/10/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/06/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/06/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/28/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/28/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/31/2014