Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 11/05/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/06/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 11/07/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/20/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/24/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/04/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/16/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/28/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/16/2014