Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/05/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/19/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 11/19/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/21/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/21/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/30/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/30/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/30/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/26/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/18/2014