Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 11/13/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 12/19/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/19/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 12/19/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/03/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/06/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/06/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/06/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/29/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/03/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/26/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/08/2014