Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/09/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/01/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/11/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/11/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/16/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/21/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/10/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/16/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/12/2014