Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/05/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/05/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/11/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/24/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/03/2014