Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 11/13/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/14/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/18/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/07/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 05/13/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/07/2014