Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 01/30/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 02/25/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/25/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/27/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/12/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/22/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/20/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/20/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/17/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/27/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/24/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/09/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/16/2014