Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/19/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/06/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 07/29/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/18/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/18/2014