Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/28/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/30/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/24/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/11/2014