Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 11/14/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 11/14/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/21/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/09/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 12/11/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/03/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 07/29/2014