Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/18/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/09/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/10/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/16/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 12/17/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/18/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 12/18/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 12/18/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 01/09/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/15/2014