Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/11/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/17/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/11/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/30/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/14/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/17/2014