Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 01/06/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/09/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/04/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/05/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/25/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/01/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/03/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/30/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/30/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/13/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/21/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/02/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/11/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/12/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/16/2014