There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Security Clearance Accountability, Reform, and Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Security Clearance Accountability, Reform, and Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Security Clearance Accountability, Reform, and Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to strengthen the accountability of individuals involved in misconduct affecting the integrity of background investigations, to update guidelines for position designation, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to strengthen the accountability of individuals involved in misconduct affecting the integrity of background investigations, to update guidelines for security clearances, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/15/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6866-6867; text as passed Senate: CR S6866)
12/01/2014By Senator Carper from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 113-276.
11/20/2014Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
11/20/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
12/16/2014-1:24pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/16/2014-12:11pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/16/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/15/2014SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6866-6867; text as passed Senate: CR S6866)
12/01/2014SenateBy Senator Carper from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 113-276.
11/20/2014SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 606.
11/20/2014SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
05/21/2014SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/20/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 11/20/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/22/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/20/2013 Referred to
05/21/2014 Markup by
11/20/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-276

No related bill information was received for S.1744.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1744. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/15/2014)

Security Clearance Accountability, Reform, and Enhancement Act - (Sec. 3) Deems a federal agency employee to be unfit for federal employment if the agency determines that such employee has engaged in misconduct affecting the integrity of a background investigation, including falsification of any information relating to such an investigation (covered misconduct). Prohibits an individual who has engaged in covered misconduct from being appointed to or continuing to occupy a position that requires the performance of background investigations.

Extends such sanctions to employees performing background investigations under a contract between an agency and a prime contractor and subcontractors (covered contract). Requires a covered contract to include provisions requiring mandatory disclosure of covered misconduct within 24 hours after the contractor discovers such misconduct and referral to the agency for investigation.

Requires the President to report to specified congressional committees on: (1) the number of individuals determined to be unfit for federal employment due to covered misconduct or ineligible to perform work under a covered contract; and (2) the details of such misconduct.

(Sec. 4) Requires the President to: (1) review and update guidance to assist agencies in determining position sensitivity designation and the appropriate background investigation to initiate for each position designation; (2) review, not less frequently than every five years, and revise the position designation of positions within federal agencies; and (3) report on any issues identified and the number of position designations revised as a result of the review.