Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 01/30/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/14/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/25/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/26/2013