Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/09/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 12/16/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 12/19/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/26/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/05/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/10/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/28/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/18/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/18/2014