Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/12/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/06/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/10/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/04/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/07/2014