Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/29/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 01/29/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/29/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/30/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/04/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/04/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/27/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/12/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/12/2013
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/19/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/28/2013