Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/09/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 12/09/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 12/09/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 12/10/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/12/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/13/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/16/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/16/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/17/2013