Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/03/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/11/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/12/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/25/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/31/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/14/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/05/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/15/2014