Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/16/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/07/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 01/27/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/25/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/17/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/16/2014