There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Commercial Flight Courtesy Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to prohibit voice communications through mobile communication devices on commercial passenger flights.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
12/12/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/16/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/04/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/11/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 09/08/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/12/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1811.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1811. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (12/12/2013)

Commercial Flight Courtesy Act - Prohibits an individual, with specified exceptions, from engaging in voice communications through a mobile communication device while onboard a domestic passenger aircraft.