There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

American Fighter Aces Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

American Fighter Aces Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the American Fighter Aces, collectively, in recognition of their heroic military service and defense of our country's freedom throughout the history of aviation warfare.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/26/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1779)
03/26/2014Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1778-1779)
12/15/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
03/27/2014-2:24pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/27/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/27/2014-1:26pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/26/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1779)
03/26/2014SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1778-1779)
12/15/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 12/15/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/19/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 12/19/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/19/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/19/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/20/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/15/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/29/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/29/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 01/29/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/29/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 01/29/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/29/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/29/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/29/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 01/29/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/04/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/04/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/04/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/04/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/04/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/10/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/10/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/10/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/10/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 02/10/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 02/10/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 02/10/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/12/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/12/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/12/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 03/05/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/05/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/10/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/10/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/10/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/10/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/10/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/10/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/10/2014
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 03/10/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/10/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/10/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/10/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/10/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/10/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/10/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/10/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/10/2014
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/10/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/10/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/10/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/10/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/10/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/10/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/10/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/10/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 03/10/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/10/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/10/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/10/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/10/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/10/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/24/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/24/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/15/2013 Referred to
03/26/2014 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1827. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/26/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

American Fighter Aces Congressional Gold Medal Act - Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a congressional gold medal to the American Fighter Aces, collectively, in recognition of their heroic military service and defense of the nation's freedom.

Requires the medal to be given to the Smithsonian Institution, where it shall be available for display or temporary loan to be displayed elsewhere, particularly at locations associated with the American Fighter Aces.