Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 12/15/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/19/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 12/19/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/19/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/19/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/20/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/15/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/29/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/29/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 01/29/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/29/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 01/29/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/29/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/29/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/29/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 01/29/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/04/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/04/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/04/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/04/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/04/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/10/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/10/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/10/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/10/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 02/10/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 02/10/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 02/10/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/12/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/12/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/12/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/05/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/05/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/10/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/10/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/10/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/10/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/10/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/10/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/10/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/10/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/10/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/10/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/10/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/10/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/10/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/10/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/10/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/10/2014
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/10/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/10/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/10/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/10/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/10/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/10/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/10/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/10/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/10/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 03/10/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/10/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/10/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/10/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/10/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/10/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/24/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/24/2014