Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/30/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/31/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 01/31/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 01/31/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/04/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/04/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/07/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/07/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/07/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/07/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/11/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/11/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/13/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/14/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/14/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/25/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/26/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/05/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/07/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/12/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/22/2013
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/11/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/23/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/26/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/01/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/30/2013