Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/18/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/19/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/20/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/30/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/30/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 05/08/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/11/2014