Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 12/17/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 12/17/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/18/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 12/18/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/19/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/20/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/13/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/13/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 01/15/2014