Limit your search

1-25 of 63
  1. S.Amdt.2728 to S.Amdt.2714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.2727 to S.Amdt.2714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 4
  3. S.Amdt.2726 to S.Amdt.2714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.2725 to S.Amdt.2714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.2724   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.2723 to S.Amdt.2714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.2722   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 4
  8. S.Amdt.2721   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.2720 to S.Amdt.2714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.2719   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 02/06/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.2718 to S.Amdt.2717 (which amends S.Amdt.2716)   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/04/2014) (Proposed 02/04/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/06/14 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S777)
  12. S.Amdt.2717 to S.Amdt.2716   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/04/2014) (Proposed 02/04/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/06/14 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S777)
  13. S.Amdt.2716   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/04/2014) (Proposed 02/04/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/06/14 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S777)
  14. S.Amdt.2715 to S.Amdt.2714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/04/2014) (Proposed 02/04/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/06/14 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S777)
  15. S.Amdt.2714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] (Submitted 02/04/2014) (Proposed 02/04/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/06/14 Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on amendment SA 2714 (Record Vote No. 23) made in Senate. (consideration: CR S794)
  16. S.Amdt.2712   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 02/03/2014)
    Cosponsors: 6
  17. S.Amdt.2651   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] (Submitted 01/14/2014)
    Cosponsors: 7
  18. S.Amdt.2650 to S.Amdt.2631   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 01/14/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  19. S.Amdt.2649   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 01/14/2014)
    Cosponsors: 7
  20. S.Amdt.2648 to S.Amdt.2631   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] (Submitted 01/13/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  21. S.Amdt.2647 to S.Amdt.2631   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 01/13/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  22. S.Amdt.2646 to S.Amdt.2631   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] (Submitted 01/13/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  23. S.Amdt.2645   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 01/13/2014)
    Cosponsors: 4
  24. S.Amdt.2644 to S.Amdt.2631   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 01/13/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0
  25. S.Amdt.2643   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 01/13/2014)
    Cosponsors: 0